Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/26/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/29/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/23/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/26/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/22/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/23/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/23/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/02/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/22/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/25/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/25/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/07/2004