Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/03/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/04/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/05/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/05/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/05/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/07/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/07/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/12/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/17/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/17/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/19/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/20/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/25/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/26/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/01/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/08/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/15/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/19/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/22/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/17/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/18/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/10/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/11/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/24/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/28/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/11/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/11/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/11/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/15/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/14/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/15/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 12/09/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/12/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/04/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/11/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/16/2004