Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/05/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/05/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/27/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/27/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/11/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/12/2003