Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/07/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/11/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/11/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/13/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/13/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/15/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/05/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/19/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/19/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/19/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/26/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/26/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 08/01/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/04/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/04/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/10/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/17/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/06/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/09/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/26/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 02/10/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/02/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/24/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/24/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/10/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/10/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/21/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/21/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/10/2004