Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/05/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/05/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/06/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/18/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/20/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/20/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/21/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/02/2003
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/10/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/14/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/19/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/19/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/19/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/19/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/19/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/19/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/19/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/19/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/19/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/19/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/19/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/19/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/19/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/19/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/20/2003