Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/04/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/12/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/17/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/19/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/14/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/03/2003