Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/06/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/06/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/06/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/11/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/12/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/12/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/18/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/08/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/28/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/29/2003