Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/05/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/11/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/11/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/16/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/31/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/24/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/22/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/25/2004