Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/23/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 10/23/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/23/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/23/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/23/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/09/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/09/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 12/09/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 12/09/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 12/09/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 12/09/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 12/09/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/19/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/19/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 04/19/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/19/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/20/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/29/2004