Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/31/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/20/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/07/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 07/30/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/29/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/29/2003