Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/18/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/09/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/03/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/21/2004