Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/07/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/20/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/07/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/28/2003