Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/06/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/17/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/03/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/24/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/23/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/24/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/10/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/16/2004