Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/10/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/14/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/24/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/24/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/27/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/20/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/30/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/11/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/20/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/26/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/23/2004