Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/07/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/12/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/19/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/27/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/03/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/11/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/30/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/06/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 06/04/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/12/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/12/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/08/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/15/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/20/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/20/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/31/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/21/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/09/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/06/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/22/2004