Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/06/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/13/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/05/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/21/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/09/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/12/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/19/2003