Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/11/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/13/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/13/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/17/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/18/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/18/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/19/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/29/2003