Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/10/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/10/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/10/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/10/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/10/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/10/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/12/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/14/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/06/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/14/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/19/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/08/2004