Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/11/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 03/11/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/11/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/26/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/31/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/01/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/07/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/09/2003