Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/29/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/29/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/29/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/07/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/07/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/17/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 09/24/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/24/2004