Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/13/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 03/13/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/13/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/18/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/18/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/18/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/11/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 05/05/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/21/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/21/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/23/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/15/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/29/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/31/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/07/2004