Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/20/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/20/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/20/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/21/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/24/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/31/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/28/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/01/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/08/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/20/2003