Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/20/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/20/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 03/20/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/20/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/20/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/20/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/25/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/25/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/26/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/26/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/26/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/26/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/27/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/31/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/07/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/07/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/09/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/28/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/29/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/29/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/07/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/15/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/23/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/10/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/11/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/11/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/12/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/16/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/17/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/18/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/25/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/25/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/27/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/14/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/16/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/16/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/24/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/29/2003