Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/23/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/12/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/24/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/13/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/17/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/17/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/24/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/31/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/09/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/11/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/22/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 11/04/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/24/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/28/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/09/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/27/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/03/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/03/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/16/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/08/2004