There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the regional headquarters building for the National Park Service under construction in Omaha, Nebraska, as the "Carl T. Curtis National Park Service Midwest Regional Headquarters Building".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/26/2003Became Public Law No: 108-37. (TXT | PDF)
06/26/2003Signed by President.
06/20/2003Presented to President.
06/16/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 0 (Roll no. 278).(text: CR H5378)
06/02/2003Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-135.
04/11/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5396-5397; text as passed Senate: CR S5397)
04/10/2003Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report.
03/25/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
06/26/2003Became Public Law No: 108-37. (TXT | PDF)
06/26/2003Signed by President.
06/20/2003SenatePresented to President.
06/16/2003-7:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/16/2003-7:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 0 (Roll no. 278). (text: CR H5378)
06/16/2003-6:59pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5381-5382)
06/16/2003-4:04pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/16/2003-3:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 703.
06/16/2003-3:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5378-5380)
06/16/2003-3:51pmHouseMr. Hayes moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/02/2003HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 53.
06/02/2003HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-135.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/21/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/21/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/13/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/12/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
04/12/2003-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
04/12/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/11/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5396-5397; text as passed Senate: CR S5397)
04/10/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 70.
04/10/2003SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
04/09/2003SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
03/25/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4381)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works03/25/2003 Referred to
04/09/2003 Markup by
04/10/2003 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/12/2003 Referred to
05/21/2003 Markup by
06/02/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-135
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management04/13/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.703.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for S.703. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-37 (06/26/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 2, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the regional headquarters building for the National Park Service under construction in Omaha, Nebraska, as the Carl T. Curtis National Park Service Midwest Regional Headquarters Building.