There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Gold Medal to Tony Blair bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a congressional gold medal to Prime Minister Tony Blair.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/17/2003Became Public Law No: 108-60. (TXT | PDF)
07/17/2003Signed by President.
07/16/2003Presented to President.
07/14/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H6681)
07/14/2003Committee on Financial Services discharged.
05/15/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 5/14/2003 S6405; text: CR 5/14/2003 S6405)
05/09/2003Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Shelby without amendment. Without written report.
03/26/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
07/17/2003Became Public Law No: 108-60. (TXT | PDF)
07/17/2003Signed by President.
07/16/2003SenatePresented to President.
07/14/2003-8:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/14/2003-8:00pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H6681)
07/14/2003-7:59pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6681)
07/14/2003-7:59pmHouseMr. King (NY) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
07/14/2003HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
05/23/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
05/15/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
05/15/2003-2:41pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/15/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/15/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 5/14/2003 S6405; text: CR 5/14/2003 S6405)
05/09/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 91.
05/09/2003SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Shelby without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
05/07/2003SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
03/26/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4440 )
03/26/2003SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4439-4440)

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/26/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/26/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/26/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/27/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/27/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/27/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/27/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/27/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/27/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/27/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/27/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/27/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/27/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/27/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/27/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/27/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/27/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/27/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/27/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/27/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/27/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/27/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/27/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/27/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/27/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/27/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/27/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/27/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/27/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/27/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/27/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/27/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/27/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/27/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/27/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/27/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/27/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/27/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/27/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/27/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/27/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/27/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/27/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/27/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 03/27/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/27/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/27/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/27/2003
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/27/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/27/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/27/2003
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/01/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/01/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 04/03/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/03/2003

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/26/2003 Referred to
05/07/2003 Markup by
05/09/2003 Reported by
House Financial Services05/15/2003 Referred to
07/14/2003 Discharged from
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology05/23/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.709. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-60 (07/17/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation, on behalf of Congress, of a gold medal to Prime Minister Tony Blair of the United Kingdom in recognition of his outstanding and enduring contributions to maintaining the security of all freedom-loving nations. Requires the Secretary of the Treasury to strike such gold medal and to strike and sell duplicate bronze medals; and (2) deposit sums received from the sale of the bronze medals into the U.S. Mint Public Enterprise Fund.