There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Animal Fighting Prohibition Enforcement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Animal Welfare Act to strengthen enforcement of provisions relating to animal fighting, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/27/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
03/27/2003Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Action By: Senate
03/27/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4527)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/06/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/12/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/05/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/11/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 06/17/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/08/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/08/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/22/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/23/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/28/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/29/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/30/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/31/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/31/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 09/10/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/11/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/11/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/16/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/25/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/26/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/29/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/29/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/14/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/14/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/23/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/03/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/03/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/03/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/03/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/05/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/25/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 12/09/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 01/23/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/10/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/10/2004
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/12/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 02/12/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 02/24/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/02/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry03/27/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.736. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/27/2003)

Animal Fighting Prohibition Enforcement Act - Amends the Animal Welfare Act to increase the imprisonment penalty for animal fighting violations from one year to two years. Makes it unlawful to sell, buy, transport, or deliver in interstate or foreign commerce a knife, gaff, or other sharp instrument used in a bird-fighting venture.

Revises enforcement provisions. Permits euthanasia for an animal in extreme pain.

Includes the Internet or any technology as interstate instrumentality.