Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/06/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/12/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/05/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/11/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 06/17/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/08/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/08/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/22/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/23/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/28/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/29/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/30/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/31/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/31/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/10/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/11/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/11/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/16/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/25/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/26/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/29/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/29/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/14/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/14/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/23/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/03/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/03/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/03/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/03/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/05/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/25/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 12/09/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 01/23/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/10/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/10/2004
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/12/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 02/12/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 02/24/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/02/2004