Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/27/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/10/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/13/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/14/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/22/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/09/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/15/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/29/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/02/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/23/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/02/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/25/2004