Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/02/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/02/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/11/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/28/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/30/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/01/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/03/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/08/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/09/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/09/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/10/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/15/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 07/15/2003