Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/08/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/08/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 04/08/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/08/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/08/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/08/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/08/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/09/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/10/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/28/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/29/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/29/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/30/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/13/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/20/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/02/2004