Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/07/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/07/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/07/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/07/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/07/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/07/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/16/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/16/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/28/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 01/29/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/29/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/05/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/05/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/11/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/24/2003