Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 04/09/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/09/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/11/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/11/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/30/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/30/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/30/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/30/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/05/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/05/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/06/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/06/2003