Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/11/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/07/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 05/07/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/13/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/19/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/20/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/23/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/23/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/04/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/09/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/24/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/17/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/11/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/15/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/24/2003