Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 04/28/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/01/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/01/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/06/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/08/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/20/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/05/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/10/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/10/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/18/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/24/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/11/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/16/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/22/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/22/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/22/2003