Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/10/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/28/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 05/12/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/20/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/23/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/02/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/11/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/11/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/31/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/02/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/17/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/23/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/24/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/04/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/11/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/25/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/06/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/13/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/19/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/14/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/16/2004