Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/07/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/08/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/12/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/22/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 06/18/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/26/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/15/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/16/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/30/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/04/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/12/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/17/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 07/06/2004