There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Marine Corps 230th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Marine Corps 230th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of the 230th Anniversary of the United States Marine Corps, and to support construction of the Marine Corps Heritage Center.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/14/2004Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Shelby without amendment. Without written report.
04/11/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
07/14/2004Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 632.
Action By: Senate
07/14/2004Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Shelby without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
06/17/2004Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
04/11/2003Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/10/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/10/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/10/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/13/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/16/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/17/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/23/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/23/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/23/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/26/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/26/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/27/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/07/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/07/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/07/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/08/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/08/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/08/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/11/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/11/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/14/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/14/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/14/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/14/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/14/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/16/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/17/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/22/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/22/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/22/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/23/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/23/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/24/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/28/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/28/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/30/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/02/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/05/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 10/01/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/14/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/30/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/30/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/30/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 10/30/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 10/30/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/30/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/30/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/30/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/30/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/30/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/30/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/30/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/30/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/30/2003
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/30/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/30/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/30/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/30/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/30/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/02/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/11/2003 Referred to
06/17/2004 Markup by
07/14/2004 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (18)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.894. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (07/14/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Marine Corps 230th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue not more than 500,000 one dollar coins which shall be emblematic of the warrior ethos of the United States Marine Corps. Requires: (1) all coin sales to include a surcharge of $10 per coin; and (2) all surcharges to be paid to the Marine Corps Heritage Foundation for construction of the Marine Corps Heritage Center.

Directs the Secretary to take such actions as may be necessary to ensure that minting and issuing coins under this Act will not result in any net cost to the U.S. Government. Prohibits a coin from being issued unless the Secretary has received: (1) full payment for the coin; (2) security to indemnify the United States for full payment; or (3) a guarantee of full payment from a depository institution, the deposits of which are insured by the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation or the National Credit Union Administration.