There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

United States Consensus Council Act of 2003

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Consensus Council Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the United States Consensus Council to provide for a consensus building process in addressing national public policy issues, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/22/2003Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins with amendments. With written report No. 108-110.
04/11/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
07/22/2003Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221.
Action By: Senate
07/22/2003Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins with amendments. With written report No. 108-110.
06/17/2003Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
04/11/2003Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/30/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/05/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs04/11/2003 Referred to
06/17/2003 Markup by
07/22/2003 Reported by S. Rept. 108-110

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.908. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/22/2003)

United States Consensus Council Act of 2003 - Establishes the United States Consensus Council to develop and conduct processes to build consensus on national policy issues.

Authorizes the Council to: (1) enter into formal relationships with other institutions; (2) identify particular public policy issues for which the Council's expertise would be useful in building a consensus; (3) coordinate with, make referrals to, and receive referrals from other conflict or dispute resolution instrumentalities, including the United States Institute for Environmental Conflict Resolution or the Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service; and (4) develop and apply criteria for determining whether the Council will enter into a consensus-building process on a particular issue. Prohibits the Council from: (1) taking any action relating to a matter within the authority of the United States Institute for Environmental Conflict Resolution or the Federal Mediation Service without the consent of the Institute or Service; or (2) duplicate or interfere with the activities and responsibilities of the Institute or Service. Requires: (1) the Institute or Service to respond to a Council consent request within 30 days; and (2) the Council, Institute, and Service to consult with one another to identify opportunities for collaboration in fulfilling their respective purposes and programs.

Vests Council powers in a Board of Directors. Prohibits any Director from being a Federal officer or employee, including a Member of Congress. Provides for a Council President appointed by the Board.

Requires the Council to report annually to the President and each House of Congress on prior-year activities and audits.

Prohibits the Council from engaging in lobbying activities or being a client.

Authorizes appropriations for FY 2003 through 2008.