Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/03/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/17/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/24/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/24/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/27/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/07/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/11/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/16/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/17/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/17/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/22/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/02/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/05/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/30/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/30/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/14/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/22/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/23/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 10/30/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 11/03/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/03/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/03/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/03/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/03/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/12/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 12/09/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/20/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 01/20/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 01/20/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/02/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/02/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/02/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/02/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/10/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/10/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/11/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/22/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/22/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/23/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/23/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/24/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/25/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/25/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/29/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/30/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/31/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/07/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/08/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/20/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/26/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/26/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/27/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/27/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/28/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/29/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/29/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/29/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/29/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/29/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/03/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/04/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/04/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/04/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/04/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/04/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/04/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/05/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/05/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/05/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/06/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/18/2004