Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/05/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/12/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/09/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/18/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 05/18/2004