Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/05/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/06/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/06/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/07/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/09/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/09/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/13/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/14/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/14/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/14/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/14/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/15/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/15/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/19/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/19/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/19/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/19/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 05/20/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/20/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/20/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/20/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/21/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/21/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/21/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/21/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/22/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/22/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/22/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/22/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/22/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/22/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/23/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/02/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 06/02/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/03/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/03/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/04/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/04/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/05/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/10/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/11/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/12/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/17/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/17/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/18/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/18/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/19/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/19/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/20/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/23/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/24/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/26/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/26/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/27/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/08/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/08/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/08/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/10/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/11/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/11/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/14/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/14/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/17/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/21/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/29/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/31/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/15/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/16/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/17/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/25/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/29/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/14/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 10/20/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/20/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/21/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/29/2003