There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Breast Cancer and Environmental Research Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize the Director of the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences to make grants for the development and operation of research centers regarding environmental factors that may be related to the etiology of breast cancer.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/01/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
05/01/2003Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5674-5675)
Action By: Senate
05/01/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5674)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/07/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/07/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/07/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/07/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/07/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/09/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/21/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/21/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/23/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/03/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/18/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/18/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/18/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/14/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/14/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/14/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/10/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/20/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/20/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/09/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 02/10/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 02/23/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/26/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/26/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/27/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/03/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/26/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/06/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/06/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/11/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 05/11/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/12/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/13/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/02/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/14/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/17/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/27/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/29/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/08/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/16/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 11/19/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/01/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.983.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.983. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/01/2003)

Breast Cancer and Environmental Research Act of 2003 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Director of the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences to make grants to public or nonprofit private entities for the development and operation of not more than eight consortium centers (each such center shall be known as a Breast Cancer and Environmental Research Center of Excellence). States that the centers shall conduct multi-disciplinary and multi-institutional research on environmental factors that may be related to the etiology of breast cancer.