Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 05/01/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/05/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/15/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/15/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/20/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/23/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/03/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/04/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/04/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/04/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/04/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/12/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/18/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/20/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/26/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/22/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/24/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/29/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/11/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/17/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/30/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/02/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/14/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/15/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/20/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/21/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/22/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/18/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/18/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 12/09/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/12/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/26/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/26/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/01/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/30/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/10/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/12/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/19/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/01/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/08/2004