There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution designating April 2003 as "Human Genome Month" and April 25 as "DNA Day".


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2989; text as passed Senate: CR S2989; text of measure as introduced: CR S2979)
02/27/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/03/2003-12:29pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/03/2003-12:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/03/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/27/2003SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2989; text as passed Senate: CR S2989; text of measure as introduced: CR S2979)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/27/2003

Committees (0)

As of 07/31/2021 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.10 - A concurrent resolution designating April 2003 as "Human Genome Month" and April 25 as "DNA Day".

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.10. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/27/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced in the Senate on February 27, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates: (1) April 25, 2003, as DNA Day in celebration of the 50th anniversary of the publication of the description of the double-helix structure of DNA (deoxyribonucleic acid) by James D. Watson and Francis H.C. Crick; and (2) April 2003 as Human Genome Month to celebrate that anniversary, the essential completion of the sequence of the human genome, and the development of a plan for the future of genomics.