Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/02/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/02/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/02/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/08/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/08/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/14/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/14/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/14/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/17/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/17/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/17/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/17/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/17/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/17/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/24/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/25/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/08/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/08/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/14/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/21/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 07/21/2004