There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution recognizing that prevention of suicide is a compelling national priority.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/23/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 9/24/2004 S9655)
09/23/2004Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 9/24/2004 S9655)
06/17/2004Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
10/08/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/24/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/24/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/24/2004-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/23/2004SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/24/2004 S9655)
09/23/2004SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/24/2004 S9655)
06/17/2004SenateReferred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR 6/18/2004 S7023-7024)
06/17/2004SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR 6/18/2004 S7024)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/17/2004 Referred to
09/23/2004 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce09/24/2004 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/08/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.119. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (09/23/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes as a compelling national priority the need to increase awareness about and prevent suicide.

Reaffirms Congress's commitment to the priorities expressed in prior legislation (which recognized suicide as a national problem and declared suicide prevention to be a national priority).

Encourages Americans, communities, and the nation to work to increase awareness about and prevent suicide.