There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution authorizing the printing of a commemorative document in memory of the late President of the United States, Ronald Wilson Reagan.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
10/10/2004Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11019; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S11019)
09/28/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H7698)
09/28/2004Committee on House Administration discharged.
07/22/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8802; text as passed Senate: CR S8802; text of measure as introduced: CR S8776)
07/22/2004Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/18/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/10/2004SenateSenate agreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11019; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S11019)
09/29/2004SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
09/28/2004-5:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2004-5:44pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7698)
09/28/2004-5:44pmHouseH.Amdt.777 On agreeing to the Doolittle amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2004-5:44pmHouseH.Amdt.777 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Doolittle.
09/28/2004-5:43pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7698)
09/28/2004-5:42pmHouseMr. Doolittle asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/2004HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
09/07/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
09/07/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/07/2004-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/22/2004SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8802; text as passed Senate: CR S8802; text of measure as introduced: CR S8776)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/22/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration09/07/2004 Referred to
09/28/2004 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.135.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.135. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/28/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the printing as a Senate document of a commemorative document in memory of the former President of the United States, Ronald Wilson Reagan, consisting of the eulogies and encomiums for him, as expressed in the Senate and the House of Representatives, together with the texts of the state funeral ceremony at the U.S. Capitol Rotunda, the national funeral service held at the Washington National Cathedral, Washington, District of Columbia, and the interment ceremony at the Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Simi Valley, California.