There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution honoring and memorializing the passengers and crew of United Airlines Flight 93.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/11/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S11325)
10/11/2004Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/13/2004Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
11/16/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
11/16/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2004-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/11/2004SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S11325)
10/11/2004SenateS.Amdt.4062 Amendment SA 4062 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/2004SenateS.Amdt.4062 Amendment SA 4062 proposed by Senator Frist for Senator Conrad. (consideration: CR S11325-11326; text: CR S11324-11325) To improve the language relating to the memorial.
10/11/2004SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S11324-11325)
10/11/2004SenateSenate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/13/2004SenateReferred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9141)
09/13/2004SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9141-9142)

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 09/13/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/14/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/14/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/14/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/14/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/14/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/14/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/20/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/20/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/20/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 09/21/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/22/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/22/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/22/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/22/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/23/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/23/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/23/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/23/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/23/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/23/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/23/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/23/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/27/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/27/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/27/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/27/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 09/29/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/30/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/30/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/04/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/04/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/04/2004
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/04/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/04/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/04/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/04/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/05/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 10/07/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/07/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/07/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/07/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/08/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/08/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/08/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/11/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/16/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration09/13/2004 Referred to
10/11/2004 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/16/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.136.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.136. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/11/2004)

States that the United States owes the passengers and crew of United Airlines Flight 93 deep respect and gratitude for their decisive actions and efforts of bravery.

Extends condolences to the families and friends of the passengers and crew of Flight 93.

Provides for the selection of an appropriate memorial to be located in the United States Capitol Building to honor the passengers and crew of Flight 93, who saved the United States Capitol Building from destruction. Requires the memorial to state the purpose of the honor and the names of the passengers and crew of Flight 93 on whom the honor is bestowed.