Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 03/13/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/08/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/15/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/07/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/10/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/01/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/10/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/10/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/10/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/16/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/16/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/17/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/17/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/25/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/20/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/21/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/22/2003